# Multiplication of a Number by a 3-Digit Number

We know to multiply two digit numbers by two-digit numbers, and three-digit numbers by one-digit or two-digit numbers.

Now, we will learn the multiplication by three-digit numbers.

In multiplication of a number by a 3-digit number are explained here step by step.

Consider the following examples on multiplication of a number by a 3-digit number:

I. Examples to multiply 2-digit numbers by a 3-digit numbers:

1. Find the product of 36 × 137

Solution:

(i) First Method

 (a) 137 = 7 + 30 + 100 (b) 36 × 7 = 252 (c) 36 × 30= 1080 (d) 36 × 100 = 3600

(ii) Second Method

 (a) 137 = 7 ones + 3 tens + 1 hundred (b) 36 × 7 ones = 252 ones (c) 36 × 8 tens = 108 tens (d) 36 × 1 hundred = 36 hundreds

II. Examples to multiply 3-digit numbers by a 3-digit numbers:

2. Multiply 543 by 278

Solution:

(i) First Method

 (a) 278 = 8 + 70 + 200 (b) 543 × 8 = 4344 (c) 543 × 70 = 38010 (d) 543 × 200 = 108600 Product = 150954

(ii) Second Method

 (a) 278 = 8 ones + 7 T + 2 H (b) 543 × 8 ones = 4344 ones (c) 543 × 7 T = 3801 tens (d) 543 × 2 H = 1086 hundreds Product = 150954

3. Multiply 827 × 107

Solution:

 → 100 + 7 Multiply by 7 Multiply by 100

4. Multiply 474 × 240

Solution:

 → 200 + 40 Multiply by 40 Multiply by 200

Multiplying by 3-Digit Number

5. Find the product of 528 and 378.

 Step I: Arrange the numbers vertically.Step II: Multiply 528 by 8             528 × 8 = 4224Step III: Multiply 528 by 70               528 × 70 = 36960Step IV: Multiply 528 by 300              528 × 300 = 158400Step V: Add: 4224, 36960 and 158400            4224 + 36960 + 158400 = 199584 Hence, 528 × 378 = 199584

6. Multiply 345 by 224.

 The product is 77,280. Step I: Multiply 345 by 4 ones.345 × 4 = 1380 ones              = 1380 Step II: Multiply 345 by 2 tens. 345 × 2 = 690 tens              = 6900 Step III: Multiply 345 by 2 hundreds. 345 × 2 = 690 hundreds             = 69000 Step IV: Add the products.

7. Multiply 625 by 124.

 Solution:124 = 100 + 20 + 4We multiply 625 by 4, 20 and 100 respectively.Finally, we add the results to get the required product.

Therefore, the product of 625 and 124 = 77,500.

III. Example to multiply 4-digit numbers by a 3-digit numbers:

8. Multiply 2437 by 324

Solution:

(i) First Method

 (a) 324 = 4 + 20 + 300 (b) 2437 × 4 = 9748 (c) 2437 × 20 = 48740 (d) 2437 × 300 = 731100

The product = 789588

(ii) Second Method

 (a) 324 = 4 ones + 2 tens + 3 hundreds (b) 2437 × 4 ones = 9748 ones (c) 2437 × 2 T = 4874 tens (d) 2437 × 3 H = 7311 hundreds The product = 789588

These are the examples discussed on multiplication of a 2-digit, 3-digit and 4-digit number by a 3-digit number.

9. Multiply 2345 by 142.

 The product is 3,32,990. Step I: Multiply 2345 by 2 ones. 2345 × 2 = 4690 ones                = 4690 Step II: Multiply 2345 by 4 tens.2345 × 4 = 9380 tens               = 93800 Step III: Multiply 2345 by 1 hundred.2345 × 1 = 2345 hundreds               = 234500 Step IV: Add the products.

10. Multiply 1519 and 402.

 Solution:402 = 400 + 0 + 2We multiply 1519 by 2, 0 and 400 respectively.Finally, we add the results to get the required product.

The product is 6,10,638.

11. Find the product of 2129 and 426.

426 = 400 + 20 + 6

We multiply 2129 by 6, 20 and 400 respectively.

Finally, we add the results to get the required product.

Therefore, 2129 × 426 = 9,06,954

Worksheet on Multiplication of a Number by a 3-Digit Number:

1. Multiply the given 3-digit numbers by a 3-digit numbers by column method.

(i) 137 × 112 = __________

(ii) 258 × 135 = __________

(iii) 429 × 283 = __________

(iv) 647 × 465 = __________

(v) 874 × 509 = __________

(vi) 173 × 194 = __________

(i) 15344

(ii) 34830

(iii) 121407

(iv) 300855

(v) 444866

(vi) 33562

2. Multiply 3-digit by 3-digit numbers:

(i) 354 by 435

(ii) 508 by 434

(iii) 458 by 392

(iv) 601 by 124

2. (i) 153990

(ii) 220472

(iii) 179536

(iv) 74524

3. Find the following products:

 (i) H T O (ii) H T O 8 5 4 8 1 6 × 2 5 4 × 6 3 4
 (iii) H T O (iv) H T O 3 5 1 6 2 1 × 2 5 3 × 1 3 6

3. (i) 216916

(ii) 517344

(iii) 88803

(iv) 84456

4. Multiply the given 4-digit numbers by a 3-digit numbers by column method.

(i) 1392 × 271 = __________

(ii) 2058 × 380 = __________

(iii) 5483 × 126 = __________

(iv) 4021 × 108 = __________

(v) 3281 × 288 = __________

(vi) 3016 × 160 = __________

4. (i) 377232

(ii) 782040

(iii) 690858

(iv) 434268

(v) 944928

(vi) 482560

5. Multiply the following.

(i) 5424 × 8

(ii) 58549 × 128

(iii) 456 × 729

(iv) 639 × 199

(v) 5024 × 632

(vi) 76592 × 8

5. (i) 43392

(ii) 7494272

(iii) 332424

(iv) 127161

(v) 3175168

(vi) 612736

6. Multiply 4-digit by 3-digit numbers:

(v) 4,032 by 196

(vi) 5,012 by 132

(vii) 5,647 by 243

(viii) 3,012 by 213

6. (v) 790272

(vi) 661584

(vii) 1372221

(viii) 641556

7. Find the following products:

 (i) Th H T O (ii) Th H T O 5 2 5 6 4 0 2 6 × 2 6 7 × 2 4 5
 (iii) Th H T O (iv) Th H T O 2 3 6 8 6 3 2 8 × 3 9 1 × 1 5 4
 (v) Th H T O (vi) Th H T O 3 8 8 4 1 9 2 4 × 2 4 3 × 3 3 0
 (vii) Th H T O (viii) Th H T O 2 0 1 8 5 3 4 2 × 1 6 4 × 1 0 3

7. (i) 1403352

(ii) 986370

(iii) 925888

(iv) 974512

(v) 943812

(vi) 634920

(vii) 330952

(viii) 550226

## You might like these

• ### Worksheet on Arranging Numbers | Comparing Numbers | Ascending Order

Practice math worksheet on arranging numbers. The questions are mainly related to arranging numbers in ascending order, descending order, comparing numbers and finding the greatest number and the smal

• ### Roman Numerals | System of Numbers | Symbol of Roman Numerals |Numbers

How to read and write roman numerals? Hundreds of year ago, the Romans had a system of numbers which had only seven symbols. Each symbol had a different value and there was no symbol for 0. The symbol of Roman Numerals and their values are: Romans used different

• ### Prime Triplet Numbers | Examples on Prime Triplet | Question Answer

A group of three consecutive prime numbers that differ by 2 is called a prime triplet. For example: (3,5,7) is the only prime triplet.

• ### Find the Missing Digits | Missing Digits in Addition and Subtraction

How to find the missing digits in the blank spaces? Add the ONES: 5 + 9 = 14 Regroup as 1 Ten and 4 Ones Add the TENS: 2 + 1 carry over = 3 Write 2 in the box to make 3 + 2 = 5 Add the HUNDREDS: 4

• ### Successor and Predecessor | Successor of a Whole Number | Predecessor

The number that comes just before a number is called the predecessor. So, the predecessor of a given number is 1 less than the given number. Successor of a given number is 1 more than the given number. For example, 9,99,99,999 is predecessor of 10,00,00,000 or we can also

• ### Formation of Greatest and Smallest Numbers | Arranging the Numbers

the greatest number is formed by arranging the given digits in descending order and the smallest number by arranging them in ascending order. The position of the digit at the extreme left of a number increases its place value. So the greatest digit should be placed at the

• ### Arranging Numbers | Ascending Order | Descending Order |Compare Digits

We know, while arranging numbers from the smallest number to the largest number, then the numbers are arranged in ascending order. Vice-versa while arranging numbers from the largest number to the smallest number then the numbers are arranged in descending order.

• ### Place Value | Place, Place Value and Face Value | Grouping the Digits

The place value of a digit in a number is the value it holds to be at the place in the number. We know about the place value and face value of a digit and we will learn about it in details. We know that the position of a digit in a number determines its corresponding value

• ### Formation of Numbers with the Given Digits |Making Numbers with Digits

In formation of numbers with the given digits we may say that a number is an arranged group of digits. Numbers may be formed with or without the repetition of digits.

We will solve the different types of problems involving addition and subtraction together. To show the problem involving both addition and subtraction, we first group all the numbers with ‘+’ and ‘-‘ signs. We find the sum of the numbers with ‘+’ sign and similarly the sum

• ### Worksheet on Roman Numerals |Roman Numerals|Symbols for Roman Numerals

Practice the worksheet on roman numerals or numbers. This sheet will encourage the students to practice about the symbols for roman numerals and their values. Write the number for the following: (a) VII (b) IX (c) XI (d) XIV (e) XIX (f) XXVII (g) XXIX (h) XII

• ### International Place-value Chart | International Place-value System

In International place-value system, there are three periods namely Ones, thousands and millions for the nine places from right to left. Ones period is made up of three place-values. Ones, tens, and hundreds. The next period thousands is made up of one, ten and hundred-thous

• ### Worksheet on Formation of Numbers | Questions on Formation of Numbers

In worksheet on formation of numbers, four grade students can practice the questions on formation of numbers without the repetition of the given digits. This sheet can be practiced by students

• ### Comparison of Numbers | Compare Numbers Rules | Examples of Comparison

Rule I: We know that a number with more digits is always greater than the number with less number of digits. Rule II: When the two numbers have the same number of digits, we start comparing the digits from left most place until we come across unequal digits. To learn

• ### Worksheets on Comparison of Numbers | Find the Greatest Number

In worksheets on comparison of numbers students can practice the questions for fourth grade to compare numbers. This worksheet contains questions on numbers like to find the greatest number, arranging the numbers etc…. Find the greatest number:

Related Concept

From Multiplication of a Number by a 3-Digit Number to HOME PAGE

Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.

## Recent Articles

1. ### 2nd Grade Place Value | Definition | Explanation | Examples |Worksheet

Sep 14, 24 04:31 PM

The value of a digit in a given number depends on its place or position in the number. This value is called its place value.

2. ### Three Digit Numbers | What is Spike Abacus? | Abacus for Kids|3 Digits

Sep 14, 24 03:39 PM

Three digit numbers are from 100 to 999. We know that there are nine one-digit numbers, i.e., 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 and 9. There are 90 two digit numbers i.e., from 10 to 99. One digit numbers are ma

3. ### Worksheet on Three-digit Numbers | Write the Missing Numbers | Pattern

Sep 14, 24 02:12 PM

Practice the questions given in worksheet on three-digit numbers. The questions are based on writing the missing number in the correct order, patterns, 3-digit number in words, number names in figures…

4. ### Comparison of Three-digit Numbers | Arrange 3-digit Numbers |Questions

Sep 13, 24 02:48 AM

What are the rules for the comparison of three-digit numbers? (i) The numbers having less than three digits are always smaller than the numbers having three digits as: