# Multiplication by Ten, Hundred and Thousand

To multiply a number by 10, 100, or 1000 we need to count the number of zeroes in the multiplier and write the same number of zeroes to the right of the multiplicand.

Rules for the multiplication by 10, 100 and 1000:

Multiply by 10:

If we multiply a whole number by a 10, then we write one zero at the end of the multiplicand.

For example:

1275 × 10 = 12750

Multiply by Tens:

To multiply by tens write one zero (0) at the end of product and then multiply the remaining numbers.

To multiply a number by 10, 20, 30, .........., 90, multiply the number by 1, 2, 3, ........, 9 respectively and insert one zero on the right of the product

For example:

1. Multiply 624 by 30

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 624 by 3.

6 2 4

×     3

1 8 7 2

Step II: Insert one arm on the right of the product to get 18720

Hence, 624 × 30 = 18720

2. Multiply 1,366 by 90

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 1369 by 9

1 3 6 9

×     9

1 2 3 2 1

Step II: Insert one zero on the right of the product to get 1,23,210.

Hence, 1,369 × 90 = 1,23,210.

Multiply by 100:

If we multiply a whole number by a 100, then we write two zeros at the end of the multiplicand.

For example:

1275 × 100 = 127500

Multiply by Hundreds:

To multiply by hundreds write two zero (00) at the end then multiply the remaining numbers.

To multiply a number by 100, 200, 300, ............... 900, we multiply the number by 1, 2, 3, ........... 9 respectively and insert two zeroes on the right of the product.

For example:

1. Multiply 167 by 300

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 167 by 3

1 6 7

×     3

5 0 1

Step II: Insert two zeros on the right of the product to get 50,100.

Hence, 167 × 300 = 50,100

2. Multiply 142 by 800

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 242 by 8.

2 4 2

×     8

1 9 3 6

Step II: Insert two zeros in the right of the product to get 1,93,600.

Hence, 242 × 800 = 1,93,600.

Multiply by 1000:  If we multiply a whole number by a 1000, then we write three zeros at the end of the multiplicand.

For example:

1275 × 1000 = 1275000

Multiply by Thousands:

To multiply by thousands write three zero (000) at the end then multiply the remaining numbers.

To multiply a number by 1,000,  2,000,  3,000, .............. 9,000, we multiply the number by 1, 2, 3, ............ 9 respectively and insert three zeroes on the right of the product.

For example:

1. Multiply 231 by 3,000.

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 231 by 3.

2 3 1

×     3

6 9 3

Step II:
Insert three zeroes on the right of the product to get 6,93,000.

Hence, 231 × 3,000 = 6,93,000.

2. Multiply 105 by 7,000.

Solution:

Step I: Multiply 105 by 7.

1 0 5

×     7

7 3 5

Step II: Insert three zeroes on the right of the product to get 7,35,000

Hence, 105 × 7000 = 7,35,000

● To multiply a number by a multiplier having zero and non-zero part, we put as many zeroes in the product as in the multiplier and then multiply the number by non-zero part.

For example:

1275 × 20 = 25500

1275 × 300 = 382500

1275 × 5000 = 6375000

You can even keep the above chart for further reference.

Worksheet on Multiplication by Ten, Hundred and Thousand

1. Compare the given wheels by writing the product in the outermost circle.

(i)

(ii)

(iii)

(iv)

2. Multiply and write the product in the outermost circle.

(i)

(ii)

(iii)

3. Multiply the following:

 (i)            Th     H     T     O                                   5         ×                 1     0         _______________ (ii)            Th     H     T     O                            2     0         ×                 1     0         _______________
 (iii)            Th     H     T     O                            9     8         ×                 1     0         _______________ (iv)            Th     H     T     O                     1     4     0         ×                 1     0         _______________
 (v)            Th     H     T     O                     3     5     8         ×                 1     0         _______________ (vi)            Th     H     T     O                                   7         ×          1     0     0         _______________
 (vii)            Th     H     T     O                            4     0         ×          1     0     0         _______________ (viii)            Th     H     T     O                            3     4         ×          2     0     0         _______________
 (ix)            Th     H     T     O                            2     5         ×          3     0     0         _______________ (x)            Th     H     T     O                            1     4         ×          4     0     0         _______________
 (xi)            Th     H     T     O                                   4       ×   2      0      0     0      _________________ (xii)            Th     H     T     O                                   3       ×   2      0      0     0      _________________
 (xiii)            Th     H     T     O                                   2       ×   4      0      0     0      _________________ (xiv)            Th     H     T     O                                   3       ×   3      0      0     0      _________________
 (xv)            Th     H     T     O                                   9       ×   1      0      0     0      _________________

4. Write the Products:

(i) 6 × 20 = _____

(ii) 3 × 30 = _____

(iii) 4 × 40 = _____

(iv) 7 × 50 = _____

(v) 20 × 300 = _____

(vi) 40 × 200 = _____

(vii) 14 × 400 = _____

(viii) 21 × 300 = _____

(ix) 2 × 2000 = _____

(x) 3 × 3000 = _____

(xi) 2 × 4000 = _____

(xii) 7 × 1000 = _____

5. Multiply the Following:

 (i)            Th     H     T     O                            1     7         ×                 5     0         _______________ (ii)            Th     H     T     O                            4     2         ×                 2     0         _______________
 (iii)            Th     H     T     O                            2     1         ×                 4     0         _______________ (iv)            Th     H     T     O                                   4          ×                 6     0         _______________
 (v)            Th     H     T     O                            1     1         ×                 3     0         _______________ (vi)            Th     H     T     O                            2     0         ×                 3     0         _______________
 (vii)            Th     H     T     O                            9     1         ×                 2     0         _______________ (viii)            Th     H     T     O                            5     5         ×                 4     0         _______________
 (ix)            Th     H     T     O                            7     1         ×                 5     0         _______________ (x)            Th     H     T     O                            2     6         ×                 8     0         _______________
 (xi)            Th     H     T     O                                   7         ×          7     0     0         _______________ (xii)            Th     H     T     O                                   9         ×          8     0     0         _______________
 (xiii)            Th     H     T     O                            1     0         ×          5     0     0         _______________ (xiv)            Th     H     T     O                            1     7         ×          4     0     0         _______________
 (xv)            Th     H     T     O                            1     9         ×          3     0     0         _______________ (xvi)            Th     H     T     O                            1     4         ×          4     0     0         _______________
 (xvii)            Th     H     T     O                            1     5         ×          6     0     0         _______________ (xviii)            Th     H     T     O                            2     7         ×          3     0     0         _______________
 (xix)            Th     H     T     O                            2     4         ×          2     0     0         _______________ (xx)            Th     H     T     O                            1     2         ×          8     0     0         _______________
 (xxi)            Th     H     T     O                                   6       ×   1      0      0     0       _________________ (xxii)            Th     H     T     O                                   4       ×   2      0      0     0       _________________
 (xxiii)            Th     H     T     O                                   2       ×   3      0      0     0       _________________ (xxiv)            Th     H     T     O                                   3       ×   2      0      0     0       _________________
 (xxv)            Th     H     T     O                                   5       ×   1      0      0     0       _________________

6. Do these Sums in your Notebook:

(i) 14 × 20 = _____

(ii) 32 × 20 = _____

(iii) 65 × 40 = _____

(iv) 33 × 50 = _____

(v) 42 × 60 = _____

(vi) 123 × 20 = _____

(vii) 436 × 20 = _____

(viii) 400 × 20 = _____

(ix) 196 × 30 = _____

(x) 152 × 50 = _____

(xi) 40 × 200 = _____

(xii) 23 × 400 = _____

(xiii) 11 × 200 = _____

(xiv) 33 × 300 = _____

(xv) 42 × 200 = _____

(xvi) 3 × 2000 = _____

(xvii) 4 × 2000 = _____

(xviii) 5 × 1000 = _____

(xix) 2 × 3000 = _____

(xx) 8 × 1000 = _____

7. Find the missing multiplicand in each of the following questions.

(i) ……………… × 40 = 36000

(ii) ……………… × 500 = 7500000

(iii) ……………… × 700 = 77000000

(iv) ……………… × 9000 = 81000

(v) ……………… × 80000 = 96000000

7. (i) 900

(ii) 15000

(iii) 110000

(iv) 9

(v) 1200

8. Fill in the blanks.

(i) 17 × 10 = __________

(ii) 68 × __________ = 68000

(iii) 25 × 100 = __________

(iv) 100 × __________ = 22500

(v) 23 × 1000 = __________

(vi) __________ × 10 = 8900

(vii) 24 × 10 = __________

(viii) __________ × 1000 = 40000

(ix) 31 × 100 = __________

(x) __________ × 1000 = 48000

(xi) 78 × 1000 = __________

(xii) __________ × 18 = 18000

(xiii) 16 × __________ = 1600

(xiv) 100 × __________ = 68200

(xv) __________ × 42 = 420

(xvi) __________ × 115 = 11500

(xvii) 723 × __________ = 7230

(xviii) __________ × 1000 = 27000

(xix) __________ × 807 = 8070

(xx) __________ × 100 = 50900

(xxi) 1000 × __________ = 63000

(xxii) 999 × 100 = __________

8. (i) 170

(ii) 1000

(iii) 2500

(iv) 225

(v) 23000

(vi) 890

(vii) 240

(viii) 40

(ix) 3100

(x) 48

(xi) 78000

(xii) 1000

(xiii) 100

(xiv) 682

(xv) 10

(xvi) 100

(xvii) 10

(xviii) 27

(xix) 10

(xx) 509

(xxi) 63

(xxii) 99900

9. Find the following products using the Rules for the multiplication by 10, 100 and 1000.

(i) 22,635 × 10

(ii) 2,469 × 10

(iii) 7,685 × 20

(iv) 5,770 × 40

(v) 9,205 × 50

(vi) 2,611 × 60

(vii) 7,685 × 20

(viii) 2,983 × 90

(ix) 11,654 × 60

(x) 9,635 × 100

(xi) 8,781 × 100

(xii) 1,050 × 400

(xiii) 187 × 800

(xiv) 267 × 500

(xv) 531 × 400

(xvi) 443 × 500

(xvii) 2,132 × 300

(xviii) 1,410 × 200

(xix) 317 × 2,000

(xx) 365 × 1,000

(xxi) 228 × 6,000

(xxii) 83 × 5,000

(xxiii) 192 × 600

(xxiv) 63 × 6,000

9. (i) 226350

(ii) 24690

(iii) 153700

(iv) 230800

(v) 460250

(vi) 156660

(vii) 153700

(viii) 268470

(ix) 699240

(x) 963500

(xi) 878100

(xii) 420000

(xiii) 149600

(xiv) 133500

(xv) 212400

(xvi) 221500

(xvii) 639600

(xviii) 282000

(xix) 634000

(xx) 365000

(xxi) 1368000

(xxii) 415000

(xxiii) 115200

(xxiv) 378000

## You might like these

• ### Worksheet on H.C.F. and L.C.M. | H.C.F. by Long Division Method | Ans

We will solve different types of problems given in the Worksheet on H.C.F. and L.C.M. I. Find highest common factor of the following by complete factorisation: (i) 48, 56, 72 (ii) 198, 360 (iii) 102, 68, 136 (iv) 1024, 576 (v) 405, 783, 513

• ### Addition of Integers | Adding Integers on a Number Line | Examples

We will learn addition of integers using number line. We know that counting forward means addition. When we add positive integers, we move to the right on the number line. For example to add +2 and +4 we move 4 steps to the right of +2. Thus, +2 +4 = +6.

• ### Rules to Add Integers | Rules For Addition of Integers | Examples |

The rules to add integers are as follows: Rule 1: When the two integers have the positive sign, add the integers and assign the (+) sign to the sum.

• ### What are integers? | Negative and Positive Integers | Natural Numbers

What are integers? The negative numbers, zero and the natural numbers together are called integers. A collection of numbers which is written as …….. -4, -3, -2, -1, 0, 1, 2, 3, 4……… . These numbers are called integers.

• ### Divisibility Rules | Divisibility Test|Divisibility Rules From 2 to 18

To find out factors of larger numbers quickly, we perform divisibility test. There are certain rules to check divisibility of numbers. Divisibility tests of a given number by any of the number 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10 can be perform simply by examining the digits of the

• ### Round off to Nearest 1000 |Rounding Numbers to Nearest Thousand| Rules

While rounding off to the nearest thousand, if the digit in the hundreds place is between 0 – 4 i.e., < 5, then the hundreds place is replaced by ‘0’. If the digit in the hundreds place is = to or > 5, then the hundreds place is replaced by ‘0’ and the thousands place is

• ### Round off to Nearest 100 | Rounding Numbers To Nearest Hundred | Rules

While rounding off to the nearest hundred, if the digit in the tens place is between 0 – 4 i.e. < 5, then the tens place is replaced by ‘0’. If the digit in the units place is equal to or >5, then the tens place is replaced by ‘0’ and the hundreds place is increased by 1.

• ### Round off to Nearest 10 |How To Round off to Nearest 10?|Rounding Rule

Round off to nearest 10 is discussed here. Rounding can be done for every place-value of number. To round off a number to the nearest tens, we round off to the nearest multiple of ten. A large number may be rounded off to the nearest 10. Rules for Rounding off to Nearest 10

• ### Rounding Numbers | How do you Round Numbers?|Nearest Hundred, Thousand

Rounding numbers is required when we deal with large numbers, for example, suppose the population of a district is 5834237, it is difficult to remember the seven digits and their order

• ### Word Problems on Multiplication and Division of Whole Numbers |Example

We will learn how to solve step-by-step the word problems on multiplication and division of whole numbers. We know, we need to do multiplication and division in our daily life. Let us solve some word problem examples.

• ### Common Multiples | How to Find Common Multiples of Two Numbers?

Common multiples of two or more given numbers are the numbers which can exactly be divided by each of the given numbers. Consider the following. (i) Multiples of 3 are: 3, 6, 9, 12, 15, 18, 21, 24, …………etc. Multiples of 4 are: 4, 8, 12, 16, 20, 24, 28, …………… etc.

• ### Common Factors | Find the Common Factor | Worksheet | Answer

Common factors of two or more numbers are a number which divides each of the given numbers exactly. For examples 1. Find the common factor of 6 and 8. Factor of 6 = 1, 2, 3 and 6. Factor

• ### Properties of Division | Division of Property Overview|Math Properties

The properties of division are discussed here: 1. If we divide a number by 1 the quotient is the number itself. In other words, when any number is divided by 1, we always get the number itself as the quotient. For example: (i) 7542 ÷ 1 = 7542 (ii) 372 ÷ 1 = 372

● Operations On Whole Numbers

Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.

## Recent Articles

1. ### Lines of Symmetry | Symmetry of Geometrical Figures | List of Examples

Aug 10, 24 04:16 PM

Learn about lines of symmetry in different geometrical shapes. It is not necessary that all the figures possess a line or lines of symmetry in different figures.

2. ### Symmetrical Shapes | One, Two, Three, Four & Many-line Symmetry

Aug 10, 24 02:25 AM

Symmetrical shapes are discussed here in this topic. Any object or shape which can be cut in two equal halves in such a way that both the parts are exactly the same is called symmetrical. The line whi…

Aug 10, 24 01:59 AM

In 6th grade math practice you will get all types of examples on different topics along with the step-by-step explanation of the solutions.

4. ### 6th Grade Algebra Worksheet | Pre-Algebra worksheets with Free Answers

Aug 10, 24 01:57 AM

In 6th Grade Algebra Worksheet you will get different types of questions on basic concept of algebra, questions on number pattern, dot pattern, number sequence pattern, pattern from matchsticks, conce…