# Multiplication of Whole Numbers

Multiplication of whole numbers is the sort way to do repeated addition.

Multiply 2345081 and 4 by expansion method.

Solution:

(2000000 + 300000 + 40000 + 5000 + 80 + 1) × 4

= (2000000 × 4) + (300000 × 4) + (40000 × 4) + (5000 × 4) + (80 × 4) + (1 × 4)

= 8000000 + 1200000 + 160000 + 20000 + 320 + 4

= 9380324

The number by which any number is multiplied is known as the multiplicand. The result of the multiplication is known as the product

Let us recall multiplication of a number by two or three digit number. Now we will learn multiplication of large numbers.

Note: Multiplication can also be referred as product.

1. Multiply 6285 by 289.

When we multiply 6285 by 289 we know, 6285 is the multiplicand and 289 is the multiplier. First with the multiplicand i.e. 6285 we will multiply by 9 and we get 56565. Then we will multiply 6285 by 8 and we get 50280 and atlast when we will multiply 6285 by 2 and we get 125700.

Therefore, after adding we get 1816365.

2. Multiply 73162453 by 2435.

In multiply 73162453 by 2435 we know, 73162453 is the multiplicand and 2435 is the multiplier.

First with the multiplicand i.e. 73162453 we will multiply by 5 and we get 365812265. Then we will multiply 73162453 by 3 and we get 2194873590, again when we will multiply 73162453 by 4 and we get 29264981200 and atlast when we will multiply 73162453 by 2 and we get 146324906000.

Therefore, after adding we get 178150573055.

Examples on multiplication of large numbers:

3. Multiply 10201 by 132

Solution:

We first arrange the numbers one below the other in columns.

Hence 10201 × 132 = 1346532

4. Multiply 98357 by 2904

Solution:

We first arrange the numbers one below the other in columns.

Hence 98357 × 2904 = 285628728

Questions and Answers on Multiplication of Whole Numbers:

I. Multiply the given numbers by expansion method.

(i) 669023 × 7

(ii) 6652309 × 6

(i) 4683161

(ii) 39913854

II. Multiply the given numbers by column method.

(i) 27613 × 26

(ii) 66924 × 35

(iii) 615028 × 43

(iv) 781145 × 57

(v) 748250 × 69

(vi) 8417129 × 81

(i) 717938

(ii) 2342340

(iii) 26446204

(iv) 44525265

(v) 51629250

(vi) 681787449

III. Multiply the following:

(i) 39176 × 264

(ii) 86542 × 5406

(iii) 789331 × 318

(iv) 96203 × 6815

(v) 845017 × 497

(vi) 55159 × 2000

(i) 10342464

(ii) 467846052

(iii) 251007258

(iv) 655623445

(v) 419973449

(vi) 110318000

## You might like these

• ### Properties of Division | Division of Property Overview|Math Properties

The properties of division are discussed here: 1. If we divide a number by 1 the quotient is the number itself. In other words, when any number is divided by 1, we always get the number itself as the quotient. For example: (i) 7542 ÷ 1 = 7542 (ii) 372 ÷ 1 = 372

We know multiplication is repeated addition. Consider the following: (i) Andrea made sandwiches for 12 people. When they shared it equally, each of them got 1/2 a sandwich. How many sandwiches did

• ### Properties of Multiplication | Multiplicative Identity | Whole Numbers

There are six properties of multiplication of whole numbers that will help to solve the problems easily. The six properties of multiplication are Closure Property, Commutative Property, Zero Property, Identity Property, Associativity Property and Distributive Property.

• ### Multiplication by Ten, Hundred and Thousand |Multiply by 10, 100 &1000

To multiply a number by 10, 100, or 1000 we need to count the number of zeroes in the multiplier and write the same number of zeroes to the right of the multiplicand. Rules for the multiplication by 10, 100 and 1000: If we multiply a whole number by a 10, then we write one

• ### Worksheet on Word Problems on Multiplication of Whole Numbers |Answers

In worksheet on Word Problems on Multiplication of Whole Numbers students can practice the questions on Multiplication of large numbers. If a Garment House manufactures 1780500 shirts in a day. How many shirts were manufactured in the month of October?

• ### Worksheet on Operations On Whole Numbers | Four Basic Operations

In worksheet on operations on whole numbers students can practice the questions on four basic operations with whole numbers. We have already learnt the four operations and now we will use the procedure for doing the basic operations on large numbers up to five-digits.

• ### Worksheet on Subtraction of Whole Numbers | Subtracting Whole Numbers

Practice the set of questions given in the worksheet on subtraction of whole numbers. The questions are based on subtracting numbers by arranging the numbers in columns and check the answer, subtraction one large number by another large number and find the missing

• ### 5th Grade Numbers Worksheets | Place Value | Standard Form | Rounding

In 5th Grade Numbers Worksheets we will solve how to read and write large numbers, use of place value chart to write a number in expanded form, compare with another number and arrange numbers in ascending and descending order. The greatest possible number formed using each

• ### 5th Grade Worksheet on Whole Numbers | 5th Grade Math Worksheets | Ans

In 5th Grade Worksheet on Whole Numbers contains various types of questions on operations on Large Numbers. The questions are based on Compare actual and the estimated numbers, mixed problems on addition, subtraction, multiplication and division of whole numbers, round off

• ### Estimation in Operations on Numbers | Round off the given Numbers

To estimate sum and difference, we first round off each number to the nearest tens, hundreds, thousands or millions and then apply the required mathematical operation. To find the estimated product or quotient, we round off numbers to the greatest place-value.

• ### Division of Whole Numbers |Relation between Dividend, Divisor Quotient

Relation between Dividend, Divisor, Quotient and Remainder is. Dividend = Divisor × Quotient + Remainder. To understand the relation between dividend, divisor, quotient and remainder let us follow the following examples:

• ### Word Problems on Multiplication and Division of Whole Numbers |Example

We will learn how to solve step-by-step the word problems on multiplication and division of whole numbers. We know, we need to do multiplication and division in our daily life. Let us solve some word problem examples.

• ### Subtraction of Whole Numbers | Whole Number |Subtract One Large Number

Subtraction of whole numbers is discussed in the following two steps to subtract one large number from another large number: Step I: We arrange the given numbers in columns, ones under ones, tens under tens, hundred under hundreds and so on.

• ### Addition of Whole Numbers | Add Large Numbers | Whole Numbers |Numbers

We arrange the numbers one below the other in the place value columns. We start adding them one by one from the right most column and take the carry over to the next column, if required. We add the digits in each column taking the carry over, if any, to the next column the

● Operations On Whole Numbers