# Examples on Multiplication of Integers

Examples on multiplication of integers on different types of questions on integers are discussed here step by step.

1. Find the products of (-10) × 11

Solution:

(-10) × 11

= - (10 × 11)

= - 110

2. Find the products of 5 × (-7)

Solution:

5 × (-7)

= - (5 × 7)

= - 35

3. Find the products of (-115) × 8

Solution:

(-115) × 8

= - (115 × 8)

= - 920

4. Find the products of 9 × (-3) × (-6)

Solution:

9 × (- 3) × (- 6)

= - {(9 × (-3)} × (- 6)

= -(9 × 3) × (-6)

= - 27 × (-6)

= 27 × 6 = 162

5. Find the products of (-12) × (-13) × (-5)

Solution:

(- 12) × (- 13) × (-5)

= {(-12) × (-13)} × (-5)

= (12 × 13 ) × (-5)

= 156 × (-5)

= -(156 × 5 )

= -780

6. Evaluate the products of (-1) × (-2) × (-3) × (-4) × (-5)

Solution:

Since the number of negative integers in the product their product is odd. Therefore their product is negative.

(-1) × (-2) × (-3) × (-4) × (-5)

= -(1×2×3×4×5)

= -(2×3×4×5)               [Since, 1 × 2 = 2]

=(6 × 4 × 5 )                [Since, 2 × 3 = 6 ]

= -(24 × 5 ) = -120        [Since, 6 × 4 = 24 ]

7. Evaluate the products of (3) × (-6) × (-9) × (-12)

Solution:

Since the number of negative integers in the given product is even. Therefore, their product is positive.

(-3) × (-6) × (-9) × (-12)

= (3 × 6 × 9 × 12)

= (18 × 9 × 12)          [Since, 3 × 6 =18]

= (162 × 12)              [Since, 18 × 9 =162]

= 1944

8. Find the value of 15625 × (-2) + (-15625) × 98

Solution:

15625 × (-2) + (-15625) × 98

= (-15625) × 2 + (-15625) × 98, [Since, 15625 × (-2) = -(15625 × 2) = (-15625 × 2)]

= (-15625) × (2 + 98),                         [Using: a × b + a × c = a × (b + c)]

= (-15625) × 100

= -(15625 × 100)

= -1562500

9. Find the value of 18946 × 99 - (-18946)

Solution:

18946 × 99 - (-18946)

= 18946 × 99 + 18946

= 18946 × 99 + 18946 × 1       [Since, 18946 = 18946×1]

= 18946 × (99 + 1)                 [Using: a × b + a × c = a × (b + c)]

= 18946 × 100

=1894600

10. Find the value of 1569 × 887 -569 × 887

Solution:

1569 × 887 – 569 × 887

= (1569 - 569) × 887       [Since, b × a - c × a = (b - c) × a]

= 1000 × 887

= 887000

Students can practice these examples on multiplication of integers which are discussed here step by step.

Numbers - Integers

Integers

Multiplication of Integers

Properties of Multiplication of Integers

Examples on Multiplication of Integers

Division of Integers

Absolute Value of an Integer

Comparison of Integers

Properties of Division of Integers

Examples on Division of Integers

Fundamental Operation

Examples on Fundamental Operations

Uses of Brackets

Removal of Brackets

Examples on Simplification

Numbers - Worksheets

Worksheet on Multiplication of Integers

Worksheet on Division of Integers

Worksheet on Fundamental Operation

Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.

Have your say about what you just read! Leave me a comment in the box below. Ask a Question or Answer a Question.

## Recent Articles

1. ### Adding 1-Digit Number | Understand the Concept one Digit Number

Sep 17, 24 02:25 AM

Understand the concept of adding 1-digit number with the help of objects as well as numbers.

2. ### Counting Before, After and Between Numbers up to 10 | Number Counting

Sep 17, 24 01:47 AM

Counting before, after and between numbers up to 10 improves the child’s counting skills.

3. ### Worksheet on Three-digit Numbers | Write the Missing Numbers | Pattern

Sep 17, 24 12:10 AM

Practice the questions given in worksheet on three-digit numbers. The questions are based on writing the missing number in the correct order, patterns, 3-digit number in words, number names in figures…

4. ### Arranging Numbers | Ascending Order | Descending Order |Compare Digits

Sep 16, 24 11:24 PM

We know, while arranging numbers from the smallest number to the largest number, then the numbers are arranged in ascending order. Vice-versa while arranging numbers from the largest number to the sma…