# Column Method of Multiplication

We will discuss here about the column method of multiplication. We know how to multiply a 2-digit number by a 1-digit number and 2-digit number. We also know how to multiply a 3-digit number by a 1-digit number. Similarly, we can multiply a 2-digit number by a 2-digit number.

Example: Multiply 84 by 36.

Solution:

Here multiplicand is 84 and multiplier is 36

Step I: Multiply multiplicand by the ones digit of multiplier i.e.,

2

8              4

×             6 ones

5              0              4 ones  partial product

Step II: Multiply multiplicand by the tens digit of multiplier i.e.,

1

8              4

×             3 tens

2              5              2 tens partial product

Add the partial products

504 ones + 252 tens

504 × 1 + 252 × 10

504 + 2520 = 3024

It actually means.

8              4

×             3              3

5              0              4                               84 × 6 = 504

2              5              2              0                        84 × 30 = 2520

3              0              2              4                        84 × 36 = 3024

Now we shall apply the same method to multiply a 3-digit number by a 2-digit number.

1              5              3

×             2              4

6              1              2        153 × 4   = 612    partial product

3              0              6              0        153 × 20 = 3060  partial product

3              6              7              2        153 × 24 = 3672

Shortcut method (3-digit number by a 2-digit number) → Without Regrouping

Step I:

1              2              3

×             1              2

6

Step II:

1              2              3

×             1              2

4              6

Step III:

1              2              3

×             1              2

2              4              6

Step IV:

1              2              3

×             1              2

2              4              6

3              ×

7              6

Step V:

1              2              3

×             1              2

2              4              6

2              3              ×

4              7              6

Step VI:

1              2              3

×             1              2

2              4              6

1              2              3              ×

1              4              7              6

3rd Grade Math Worksheets

3rd Grade Math Lessons

From Column Method of Multiplication to HOME PAGE

Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.

Have your say about what you just read! Leave me a comment in the box below. Ask a Question or Answer a Question.

## Recent Articles

1. ### Successor and Predecessor | Successor of a Whole Number | Predecessor

May 24, 24 06:42 PM

The number that comes just before a number is called the predecessor. So, the predecessor of a given number is 1 less than the given number. Successor of a given number is 1 more than the given number…

2. ### Counting Natural Numbers | Definition of Natural Numbers | Counting

May 24, 24 06:23 PM

Natural numbers are all the numbers from 1 onwards, i.e., 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, …... and are used for counting. We know since our childhood we are using numbers 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, ………..

3. ### Whole Numbers | Definition of Whole Numbers | Smallest Whole Number

May 24, 24 06:22 PM

The whole numbers are the counting numbers including 0. We have seen that the numbers 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6……. etc. are natural numbers. These natural numbers along with the number zero

4. ### Math Questions Answers | Solved Math Questions and Answers | Free Math

May 24, 24 05:37 PM

In math questions answers each questions are solved with explanation. The questions are based from different topics. Care has been taken to solve the questions in such a way that students