Practice the questions given in the worksheet on multiplication tables from 2 to 9.
We know, the number to be multiplied is called the multiplicand. The number by which we multiply is called the multiplier. The answer obtained is called the product.
Note:
The answer of multiplication is called the product. The numbers that are being multiplied are called factors. For example,
12
× 8
96
Here, 12 and 8 are the factors and 96 is the product.
I. Put (T) for the correct and (F) for the wrong answer. Also write the correct answer where necessary:
(i) 7 × 9 = 58
(ii) 8 × 10 = 70
(iii) 5 × 6 = 30
(iv) 7 × 7 = 59
(v) 4 × 4 = 8
(vi) 5 × 9 = 45
(vii) 8 × 8 = 18
(viii) 4 × 7 = 47
(ix) 6 × 10 = 60
(x) 8 × 6 = 68
(xi) 3 × 10 = 13
(x) 9 × 4 = 38
II. Write the multiplication facts for the following. Also find the product:
(i) 23 + 23 + 23 + 23 + 23 =..................
Product =..................
(ii) 57 + 57 + 57 + 57 = ..................
Product =..................
(iii) 69 + 69 + 69 + 69 + 69 + 69 = ..................
Product =..................
(iv) 87 + 87 + 87 = ..................
Product =..................
(v) 102 + 102
Product =..................
(vi) 150 + 150 + 150 = ..................
Product =..................
(vii) 500 + 500 + 500 + 500 + 500 + 500 + 500 + 500 = ..................
Product =..................
III. Write the addition facts for the following:
(i) 5 × 60
(ii) 3 × 125
(iii) 4 × 200
(iv) 2 × 610
(v) 6 × 95
(vi) 7 × 700
(vii) 9 × 10
(viii) 8 × 25
IV. Find the product of the following:
(i) 5 × 30
(ii) 7 × 50
(iii) 2 × 60
(iv) 3 × 80
(v) 4 × 90
(vi) 6 × 40
(vii) 8 × 20
(viii) 9 × 10
(ix) 8 × 200
(x) 3 × 700
(xi) 5 × 600
(xii) 7 × 300
(xiii) 9 × 100
(xiv) 2 × 800
(xv) 4 × 500
(xvi) 6 × 400
V. Complete the following:
(i) .......... × .......... = 80
(ii) .......... × .......... = 1300
(iii) .......... × .......... = 750
(iv) .......... × .......... = 800
(v) .......... × .......... = 1000
(vi) .......... × .......... = 450
(vii) .......... × .......... = 3600
(viii) .......... × .......... = 2100
(ix) .......... × .......... = 5900
(x) .......... × .......... = 940
VI. Answer the following:
(i) 6 × 3 tens = 18 tens or 18 × 10 = 180
(ii) 5 × 2 hundreds = .......... or .......... = ..........
(iii) 4 × 8 tens = .......... or .......... = ..........
(iv) 6 × 4 tens = .......... or .......... = ..........
(v) 9 × 5 hundreds = .......... or .......... = ..........
(vi) 7 × 6 hundreds = .......... or .......... = ..........
(vii) 8 × 2 tens = .......... or .......... = ..........
(viii) 3 × 7 hundreds = .......... or .......... = ..........
Answers for the worksheet on multiplication tables from 2 to 9 are given below.
Answers:
I. (i) F, 63
(ii) F, 80
(iii) T
(iv) F, 49
(v) F, 16
(vi) T
(vii) F, 64
(viii) F, 28
(ix) T
(x) F, 48
(xi) F, 30
(x) F, 36
II. (i) 5 × 23
Product = 115
(ii) 4 × 57
Product =228
(iii) 6 × 69
Product = 414
(iv) 3 × 87
Product =261
(v) 2 × 102
Product = 204
(vi) 3 × 150
Product = 450
(vii) 8 × 500
Product = 4000
III. (i) 60 × 60 × 60 × 60 × 60
(ii) 125 × 125 × 125
(iii) 200 × 200 × 200 × 200
(iv) 610 × 610
(v) 95 × 95 × 95 × 95 × 95
(vi) 700 × 700 × 700 × 700 × 700 × 700 × 700
(vii) 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10 × 10
(viii) 25 × 25 × 25 × 25 × 25 × 25 × 25 × 25
IV. (i) 150
(ii) 350
(iii) 120
(iv) 240
(v) 360
(vi) 240
(vii) 160
(viii) 90
(ix) 1600
(x) 2100
(xi) 3000
(xii) 2100
(xiii) 900
(xiv) 1600
(xv) 2000
(xvi) 2400
V. (i) 8, 10
(ii) 13, 100
(iii) 75, 10
(iv) 8, 100
(v) 10, 100
(vi) 45, 10
(vii) 36, 100
(viii) 21, 100
(ix) 59, 100
(x) 94, 10
VI. (ii) 10 hundreds, 10 × 100, 1000
(iii) 32 tens, 32 × 10, 320
(iv) 24 tens, 24 × 10, 240
(v) 45 hundreds, 45 × 100, 4500
(vi) 42 hundreds, 42 × 100, 4200
(vii) 16 tens, 16 × 10, 160
(viii) 21 hundreds, 21 × 100, 2100
From Worksheet on Multiplication Tables from 2 to 9 to HOME PAGE
Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.
Jul 19, 24 03:26 PM
Jul 19, 24 11:13 AM
Jul 19, 24 02:00 AM
Jul 19, 24 02:00 AM
Jul 19, 24 01:59 AM
New! Comments
Have your say about what you just read! Leave me a comment in the box below. Ask a Question or Answer a Question.