# Multiplier by 10, 100, 1000, 10000

We will learn about the multiplier by 10, 100, 1000, 10000.

We add a zero to the extreme right of the multiplicand while by 10.

For example:

(i) 26 × 10 = 260

(ii) 524 × 10 = 5240

We add two zero to the extreme right of the multiplicand while by 100.

For example:

(i) 26 × 100 = 2600

(ii) 524 × 100 = 52400

We add three zero to the extreme right of the multiplicand while by 1000.

For example:

(i) 26 × 1000 = 26000

(ii) 524 × 1000 = 524000

We add four zero to the extreme right of the multiplicand while by 10000.

For example:

(i) 26 × 10000 = 260000

(ii) 524 × 10000 = 5240000

Multiplication by multiples of 10, 100, 1000, 10000:

We multiply the multiplicand by the non-zero digit of the multiplier. Then we add the same number of zero to the extreme right of the product as the multiplier has.

We can understand this method as follows.

1. First we count the zeros.

2. We multiply the non – zero numbers.

3. We place the same number of zero to the extreme right of the product

Find the product of the following:

(i) 3846 × 20

Solution:

Number of zero = 1

Product of non-zero numbers = 3846 × 2 = 7692

Place 1 zero at extreme right of the product = 76920

Thus, 3846 × 20 = 76920

(ii) 1125 × 300

Solution:

Number of zero = 2

Product of non-zero numbers = 1125 × 3 = 3375

Place 2 zeros at extreme left of the product = 337500

Thus, 1125 × 300 = 337500

(iii) 2420 × 7000

Solution:

Number of zero = 4

Product of non-zero numbers = 242 × 7 = 1694

Place 4 zeros at extreme left of the product = 16940000

Thus, 2420 × 7000 = 16940000

Didn't find what you were looking for? Or want to know more information about Math Only Math. Use this Google Search to find what you need.

## Recent Articles

1. ### Comparison of Numbers | Compare Numbers Rules | Examples of Comparison

May 18, 24 02:59 PM

Rule I: We know that a number with more digits is always greater than the number with less number of digits. Rule II: When the two numbers have the same number of digits, we start comparing the digits…

2. ### Numbers | Notation | Numeration | Numeral | Estimation | Examples

May 12, 24 06:28 PM

Numbers are used for calculating and counting. These counting numbers 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, .......... are called natural numbers. In order to describe the number of elements in a collection with no objects

3. ### Face Value and Place Value|Difference Between Place Value & Face Value

May 12, 24 06:23 PM

What is the difference between face value and place value of digits? Before we proceed to face value and place value let us recall the expanded form of a number. The face value of a digit is the digit…

4. ### Patterns in Numbers | Patterns in Maths |Math Patterns|Series Patterns

May 12, 24 06:09 PM

We see so many patterns around us in our daily life. We know that a pattern is an arrangement of objects, colors, or numbers placed in a certain order. Some patterns neither grow nor reduce but only r…